The multiplication table, known as the “11 times table,” allows us to calculate the result of multiplying 11 by whole numbers. Learning the eleven times table is more straightforward since the same digit is repeatedly used in the multiples.

There is a straightforward method for dividing single-digit values by 11. Take the number you are multiplying by 11, for instance, 5, and think of the same number next to it. Hence, 11 × 5 = 55. This method works up to the number 9.

#### Download printable table

Want to download a printable version of this table? Click here

**When are the eleven times multiplication tables taught to students?**

Multiplication tables are taught to learners aged 6 to 8 years old or 2^{nd} or 3^{rd} grades (USA).

One of the simpler times tables children memorize is the 11 times multiplication table. The multiplication table of 11 is essential for tackling division and multiplication-based math problems. Finding multiples of 11 is a handy skill.

**11 Times Multiplication Table in Words**

The following is how we read the 11 times multiplication table:

How we write 11 times table | How we read11 times table |

11 × 1 = 11 | Eleven times one is equal to 11 |

11 × 2 = 22 | Eleven times two is equal to 22 |

11 × 3 = 33 | Eleven times three is equal to 33 |

11 × 4 = 44 | Eleven times four is equal to 44 |

11 × 5 = 55 | Eleven times five is equal to 55 |

11 × 6 = 66 | Eleven times six is equal to 66 |

11 × 7 = 77 | Eleven times seven is equal to 77 |

11 × 8 = 88 | Eleven times eight is equal to 88 |

11 × 9 = 99 | Eleven times nine is equal to 99 |

11 × 10 = 110 | Eleven times ten is equal to 110 |

11 × 11 = 121 | Eleven times eleven is equal to 121 |

11 × 12 = 132 | Eleven times twelve is equal to 132 |

**Tips to Master 11 Times Multiplication Table**

( a ) *Any single-digit natural number multiplied by 11 results in a product that is written twice.*

Multiply the numbers from 1 to 9 by 1, then repeat the result to get the products for the 11 times table. But remember that you can only use this technique to find the multiples of 11 through 11× 9.

11 × 1 = 11 |

11 × 2 = 22 |

11 × 3 = 33 |

11 × 4 = 44 |

11 × 5 = 55 |

11 × 6 = 66 |

11 × 7 = 77 |

11 × 8 = 88 |

11 × 9 = 99 |

( b ) *When you multiply by 11, you keep adding the number 11.*

Let us say, for example, that when we say 11 times 4 (11 × 4), the number 11 is added four times.

Hence, for more examples in the 11 times table we have,

11 × 1 = **11**

11 × 2 = 11 + 11 = **22**

11 × 3 = 11 + 11 + 11 = **33**

11 × 4 = 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 = **44**

11 × 5 = 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 = **55**

11 × 6 = 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 = **66**

11 × 7 = 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 +11 = **77**

11 × 8 = 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 +11 + 11 = **88**

11 × 9 = 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 +11 + 11 + 11 = **99**

11 × 10 = 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 +11 + 11 + 11 + 11= **110**

11 × 11 = 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 +11 + 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 = **121**

11 × 12 = 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 +11 + 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 + 11 = **132**

( c ) *Use the 10 times multiplication table to learn the 11 times table *

Using the multiplication table for 10 is a simple technique to obtain the products of the 11 times table. The number is first multiplied by 10 then add the multiplier to the answer.

10 timesmultiplication table | Adding the multiplier | 11 timesMultiplication table |

10 × 1 = 10 | 10 + 1 =11 | 11 × 1 = 11 |

10 × 2 = 20 | 20 + 2 = 22 | 11 × 2 = 22 |

10 × 3 = 30 | 30 + 3 = 33 | 11 × 3 = 33 |

10 × 4 = 40 | 40 + 4 = 44 | 11 × 4 = 44 |

10 × 5 = 50 | 50 + 5 = 55 | 11 × 5 = 55 |

10 × 6 = 60 | 60 + 6 = 66 | 11 × 6 = 66 |

10 × 7 = 70 | 70 + 7 = 77 | 11 × 7 = 77 |

10 × 8 = 80 | 80 + 8 = 88 | 11 × 8 = 88 |

10 × 9 = 90 | 90 + 9 = 99 | 11 × 9 = 99 |

10 × 10 = 100 | 100 + 10 = 110 | 11 × 10 = 110 |

10 × 11 = 110 | 110 + 11 = 121 | 11 × 11 = 121 |

10 × 12 = 120 | 120 + 12 = 132 | 11 × 12 = 132 |

( d ) *11 times table for 2 digits numbers*

When a number with two digits is multiplied by 11, add the two digits together and insert the result between the two digits of the original two-digit number. For example, when 23 is multiplied by 11, we can have 2 + 3 = 5, then insert 5 between 2 and 3. Hence, 11 × 23 = 253.

For another example, 11 × 35 = 3**8**5. When we add the 3 and 5, the result is 8, which must be written between the 35.

This technique only applies when the sum of the digits is 9 and below. There is an extra step to perform to get the product—for example, 11 × 57. Since 5 + 7 equals 12, only the number 2 (ones place) must be placed between 5 and 7, and the 1 (tens place) must be added to 5. Hence, 11 × 57 = 627.

## Recommended Worksheets

Division Tables (World Cancer Awareness Day Themed) Math Worksheets

Subtraction Table (Rosh Hashanah Theme) Math Worksheets

Multiplication Tables (St. Patrick’s Day Themed) Math Worksheets