We’ve already seen how to multiply by single digit numbers using this simple method as well as this quicker way using regrouping. We can combine these two methods of multiplying to multiply by 2-digit numbers as shown in the example below:
Multiplying by 2-Digit Numbers
Common error when multiplying
When using the method above to multiply numbers with two or more digits, it is important that students understand where and why they must add zeros. The example below shows a fairly common error that students who do not fully understand the process can make.
As with most calculations, estimating to check whether the calculated answer is reasonable is a good way to catch errors like the made above.
Try the worksheets below for more practice with multiplying by 2-digit numbers.
- 2 x 2 digit – no regrouping e.g. 42 x 23
- 2 x 2 digit – regrouping e.g. 57 x 34
- 3 x 2 digit e.g. 234 x 36
- 4 x 1 digit e.g. 5316 x 8
- 4 x 2 digit e.g. 5316 x 28
- 3 x 3 digit e.g. 829 x 115
You’ll find more printable multiplication worksheets here.