—— Note: The Information above this point will not be sent to your printer ——–

12 x 8 =

9 x 12 = 108

9 x 12 =

8 x 9 = 72

9 x 12 =

12 x 8 = 96

8 x 9 =

9 x 12 = 108

—— End of Page 1 ——

12 x 11 =

12 x 12 = 144

12 x 8 =

8 x 9 = 72

12 x 12 =

12 x 11 = 132

8 x 9 =

12 x 8 = 96

—— End of Page 2 ——

8 x 9 =

9 x 12 = 108

9 x 9 =

8 x 10 = 80

9 x 12 =

8 x 9 = 72

8 x 10 =

9 x 9 = 81

—— End of Page 3 ——

9 x 9 =

8 x 12 = 96

12 x 12 =

10 x 9 = 90

8 x 12 =

9 x 9 = 81

10 x 9 =

12 x 12 = 144

—— End of Page 4 ——

12 x 8 =

9 x 9 = 81

10 x11 =

8 x 9 = 72

9 x 9 =

12 x 8 = 96

8 x 9 =

10 x11 = 110

—— End of Page 5 ——

10 x 8 =

9 x 11 = 99

11 x 10 =

10 x 9 = 90

9 x 11 =

10 x 8 = 80

10 x 9 =

11 x 10 = 110

—— End of Page 6 ——

11 x 11 =

9 x 9 = 81

12 x 10 =

10 x 11 = 110

9 x 9 =

11 x11 = 121

10 x 11 =

12 x 10 = 120

—— End of Page 7 ——

11 x 8 =

12 x 12 = 144

8 x 9 =

9 x 8 = 72

12 x 12 =

11 x 8 = 88

9 x 8 =

8 x 9 = 72

—— End of Page 8 ——

—— Note: The Information below this point will not be sent to your printer ——–

## Related Resources

The Multiplication Flashcard shown above is aligned with standard 4NBT05 taken from the Common Core Standards For Mathematics (see the extract below) as are the resources listed below.

*Multiply a whole number of up to four digits by a one-digit whole number, and multiply two two-digit numbers, using strategies based on place value and the properties of operations. Illustrate and explain the calculation by using equations, rectangular arrays, and/or area models. *

### Example/Guidance

### Flashcard

- 2-digit x 1-digit e.g. 15 x 5, 20 x 8

### Worksheet

- 2 x 1 digit e.g. 54 x 5 requires only 2x, 5x, or 10x multiplication facts.
- 3 x 1 digit e.g. 512 x 7 requires only 2x, 5x, or 10x multiplication facts.
- Creative Multiplication (6-page with guidance notes and examples)
- 2 x 1-digit – Products to 99 e.g. 23 x 2
- 2 x 1-digit – Products to 999 e.g. 93 x 4
- 2 x 1-digit – regrouping e.g. 73 x 7
- 3 x 1-digit e.g. 436 x 7
- 2 x 2-digit no regrouping e.g. 42 x 23
- 2 x 2-digit regrouping e.g. 57 x 34
- 4 x 1-digit e.g. 5316 x 8

#### Third/ Fourth Grade

#### Worksheet Generator

- Box Method Multiplication : 1-digit x 2-digit
- Partial Products Method Multiplication

Similar to the above listing, the resources below are aligned to related standards in the Common Core For Mathematics that together support the following learning outcome:

*Use place value understanding and properties of operations to perform multi-digit arithmetic*

- Divisibility Rules For 2, 3 ,4, 5 ,6 & 9 (From Example/Guidance)
- Addition & Subtraction (larger numbers) e.g. up to 999,999 (From Worksheet)
- Addition with up to 8 Numbers: Worksheet Generator (From Worksheet)
- Three 3-digit numbers e.g. 247 + 114 + 598 (From Worksheet)
- 4-digit numbers e.g. 3286 – 1468 (From Worksheet)
- Four 4-digit numbers e.g. 2347 + 1214 + 5198 + 6548 (From Worksheet)
- Dividends to 99 with remainders e.g. 97 ÷ 5 (From Worksheet)
- 3-digit by 1-digit e.g. 507 ÷ 9 (From Worksheet)
- 4-digit by 1-digit e.g. 9337 ÷ 6 (From Worksheet)
- 5-digit numbers e.g. 47324 + 24743 + 3255 (From Worksheet)